CO HB1345 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning payment of expenses of the legislative department.
Title
Fiscal Year 2020-21 Legislative Appropriation Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1345 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1345, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1345 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 53 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1345, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | Governor Signed | |
2020-06-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-06-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2020-06-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2020-06-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Appropriations |