CO HB1311 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Clarify Definition Of Veterinary Premises
Title
Clarify Definition Of Veterinary Premises
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer HB 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole, unamended, and with a recommendation that it be added to the consent calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2013-04-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |