CO HB1311 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-10 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increase No Of Regional Tourism Projects
Title
Increase No Of Regional Tourism Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-10 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-10 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed | |
2011-05-06 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | |
2011-05-04 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-03 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-05-02 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-28 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-27 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |