CO HB1271 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a state income tax credit for qualified individuals in the veterinary field.
Title
State Income Tax Credit for Veterinary Professional
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Reconsider the adoption of amendment L006 (Attachment B) to HB 24-1271. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Reconsider the adoption of amendment L.008 (Attachment A) to HB 24-1271. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Reconsider the adoption of amendment L.005 (Attachment C) to HB 24-1271. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Postpone House Bill 24-1271 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Reconsider the adoption of amendment L006 (Attachment B) to HB 24-1271. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Reconsider the adoption of amendment L.008 (Attachment A) to HB 24-1271. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Reconsider the adoption of amendment L.005 (Attachment C) to HB 24-1271. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment F). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment E). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment D). (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - House Finance: Postpone House Bill 24-1271 indefinitely. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1271, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Finance Reconsider to Finance |
2024-04-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |