CO HB1267 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning culturally relevant training available to health-care providers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Culturally Relevant Training Health Professionals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.009 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment D). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment C). (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment D). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 22-1267, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-06 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-10 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-05-09 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2022-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-25 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |