CO HB1266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the modification of the requirements for the sale of fireworks for transport by the purchaser pursuant to an exporter of fireworks license.
Title
Sale And Transport Of Fireworks Exporter License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Postpone House Bill 20-1266 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1266, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2020-03-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-02-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-03 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |