CO HB1230 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning protection for Colorado residents from federal government overreach based on a person's status.
Title
Protect Colorado Residents From Federal Government Overreach
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1230 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1230 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1230, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1230, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 17-1230 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-30 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 27 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1230, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1230, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | House Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-03-23 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-03-21 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |