CO HB1226 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-08 - Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/10/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
No Concealed Carry At Colleges
Title
No Concealed Carry At Colleges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute to P.I (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute to P.I (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute to P.I (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Substitute to P.I (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1226 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over to 05/10/2013 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2013-02-18 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-15 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-13 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |