CO HB1176 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an extension of the employment after retirement limitations for retirees of the public employees' retirement association employed by a rural school district after retirement.
Title
PERA Public Employees' Retirement Association Retirees Employed By Rural School Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment A). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B). (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment A). (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Refer House Bill 17-1176, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Education: Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment B). (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1176 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Finance: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment C). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 17-1176, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-04-26 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2017-04-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance + Appropriations |