CO HB1170 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning authorization to drive military vehicles on roadways.
Title
Military And Surplus Military Vehicles On Roadways
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Postpone House Bill 20-1170 indefinitely. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1170, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1170, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E). (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1170, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1170, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |