CO HB1130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-26 - Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the online availability of opinions issued by Colorado courts.
Title
Online Availability Of Judicial Opinions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Postpone House Bill 20-1130 indefinitely. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1130 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1130 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1130, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Postpone Indefinitely |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2020-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-01-28 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2020-01-15 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary + Appropriations |