CO HB1033 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strategic Planning Group On Aging
Title
Strategic Planning Group On Aging
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment J) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.013 (Attachment J) to specify that the three consumers on the planning group must include at least one man and one woman (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend page 4, line 37, after "income" insert "gender, " (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment J.001 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.010 (Attachment F) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.011 (Attachment H) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment J) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend L.013 (Attachment J) to specify that the three consumers on the planning group must include at least one man and one woman (Y: 6 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend page 4, line 37, after "income" insert "gender, " (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1033, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2015-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-17 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |