CA SCR62 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Spay/Neuter Awareness Month.
Title
Spay/Neuter Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR62 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR62 Steinberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR62 Steinberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-02-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:15 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2012-02-23 | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. | |
2012-02-23 | Read. Adopted. (Page 3798.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-02-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-17 | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 17). | |
2012-02-09 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2012-02-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2786.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |