CA SCR41 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-06-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Motorcycle Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycle Safety Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-06-10 - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Special Consent Cal SCR41 Huff (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-26SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2013.
2013-06-26SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
2013-06-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-06-24AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 2129.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-06-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 10).
2013-06-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2013-05-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2013-05-16SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 949.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-15SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading. Ordered to special consent calendar.
2013-05-06SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback