CA SCR132 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Scoliosis Awareness Month.
Title
Scoliosis Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - SCR 132 Lieu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR132 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR132 Lieu (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6249.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-08-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4297.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |