CA SCR104 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-19)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-19)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week.
Title
Mitochondrial Disease Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-19 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR104 Huff (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR104 Huff (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR104 Huff (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 124, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-08-25 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4602.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 6029.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 3534.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |