CA SCA3 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 8 of Article IV thereof, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Legislative procedure.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 9). |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_3&sess=1516&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/15-16/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_3_bill_20150204_introduced.html |