CA SCA15 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-01 - Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 9 of Article IX thereof, relating to the University of California.
Title
University of California: retirement benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 2044.) Set for hearing September 3. |
2013-08-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R., ED., and E. & C.A. |
2013-08-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-08-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED., P.E. & R., and E. & C.A. |
2013-07-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after August 10. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_15&sess=1314&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_15_bill_20130710_introduced.html |