CA SB934 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Hearing: Jun 17 @ 2:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & E.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Hearing: Jun 17 @ 2:30 pm in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14517.5 to the Government Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Zero-emission freight infrastructure: interagency coordination: report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB934 Gonzalez (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and U. & E. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 3.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3964.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 1. Page 3700.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 3535.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E., U. & C. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9 in TRANS. pending receipt. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16. |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14517.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |