CA SB915 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Set for hearing May 6.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 10:00 am in 1021 O Street, Room 2200
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53075.1 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: autonomous vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23 in TRANS. pending receipt. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 9. |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53075.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |