CA SB901 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 3236.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-22 - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 3236.) Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2704.045 and 2704.096 to, and to add and repeal Section 2704.78 of, the Streets and Highways Code, relating to high-speed rail, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
High-speed rail: funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Robert Huff [R] | Asm. Tim Donnelly [R] |
Asm. Jeff Gorell [R] | Asm. Diane Harkey [R] | Sen. Brian Jones [R] | Asm. Kristin Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-22 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 1 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 6. Page 3236.) Reconsideration granted. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.096 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 2704.78 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |