CA SB9 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 30 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 828, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1170 of the Penal Code, relating to sentencing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-08-20 - Unfinished Business SB9 Yee Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - SB9 Yee Senate Third Reading By CEDILLO (Y: 41 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-09-07 - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - SB9 Yee Senate Third Reading By CEDILLO Amend By CEDILLO Set #1 (Y: 37 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-09-02 - SB9 Yee Motion to Reconsider By CEDILLO (Y: 44 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-08-25 - SB9 Yee Senate Third Reading By CEDILLO (Y: 36 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2011-08-17 - Do pass (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-07-05 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Senate 3rd Reading SB9 Yee (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-26 - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-23 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 828, Statutes of 2012.
2012-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2012-08-22 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2012-08-20 Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 4580.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2012-08-16 In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2012-08-16 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 34. Page 5975.) Ordered to the Senate.
2012-07-02 Read third time and amended. (Page 5557.) Ordered to third reading.
2012-02-02 Read third time and amended. (Page 3681.) Ordered to third reading.
2011-09-08 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-09-07 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (September 7).
2011-09-06 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2011-09-06 Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2940.)
2011-09-02 Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 44. Noes 28. Page 2864.) Read third time and amended. (Ayes 37. Noes 30. Page 2865.) Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-29 Motion to reconsider continued to September 2.
2011-08-25 Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 36. Page 2600.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Cedillo.
2011-08-22 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-08-18 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 6.) (August 17).
2011-08-15 From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-07-06 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-06-16 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2011-06-02 In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2011-06-01 Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1229.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2011-05-31 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2011-05-27 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2011-05-26 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 1111.) (May 26).
2011-05-25 Set for hearing May 26.
2011-05-23 Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2011-05-13 Set for hearing May 23.
2011-05-02 Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2011-04-13 Set for hearing May 2.
2011-04-05 From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 543.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2011-03-25 Set for hearing April 5.
2011-01-20 Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2010-12-07 From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6.
2010-12-06 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1170Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_9&sess=1112&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20101206_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20110527_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20110815_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20110902_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20110906_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20120202_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20120702_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20120821_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_bill_20120930_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110405_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110526_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110601_0141PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110705_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110817_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110825_0104PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110902_1236PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110902_1248PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20110907_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20120816_1103AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_9_vote_20120820_0349PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback