CA SB895 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3.3 (commencing with Section 78045) of Chapter 1 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
Community colleges: Baccalaureate Degree in Nursing Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | April 10 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | April 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2024-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78045 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |