CA SB843 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-30 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44030.5, 44242.5, 44930, 44932, 44934, 44936, 44939, 44940, 44943, 44944, and 44947 of, and to add Sections 44930.5 and 44944.2 to, the Education Code, relating to school employees.
Title
School employees: discipline: dismissal and suspension.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Correa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | April 23 hearing rescheduled for April 24. |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 1008 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44030.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44242.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44930 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44930.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44932 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44932.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44934 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44936 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44937 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44938 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44939 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44941 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44943 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44944 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44944.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44944.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 44945 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44947 | Amended Code | Citation Text |