CA SB647 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 20.7 (commencing with Section 69999.10) of Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to postsecondary education.
Title
California National Guard Education Assistance Award
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Denham [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-04-29 | Held in committee without recommendation. | |
2009-04-24 | Set for hearing April 29. | |
2009-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2009-04-20 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-04-15 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-13 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2009-03-25 | Set for hearing April 14. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on V.A. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |