CA SB61 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-09-06 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 230 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 225, 226, and 229 of, and to add Section 208.3 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juveniles: solitary confinement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-30 - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate 3rd Reading SB61 Yee (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-06AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins.
2013-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-04AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-09-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2013-08-14AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 25).
2013-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1170.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-28SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23).
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-05-13SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2013-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 665.) (April 23).
2013-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2013-01-17SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-01-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
2013-01-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected January 22.)

Code Citations


California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_61&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130108_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130403_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130430_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130702_amended_asm_v95.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130702_amended_asm_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130108_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130403_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130430_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130702_amended_asm_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_bill_20130904_amended_asm_v94.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_vote_20130423_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_vote_20130513_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_vote_20130529_0600PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_vote_20130625_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0051-0100/sb_61_vote_20130830_000002_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback