CA SB568 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 22.1 (commencing with Section 22580) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Internet.
Title
Privacy: Internet: minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB568 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 568 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB568 Steinberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - SB 568 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By DICKINSON (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB568 Steinberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 336, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2040.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 12. Page 2717.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). |
2013-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and JUD. |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 710.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 663.) (April 23). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22580 | New Code | See Bill Text |