CA SB530 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 467.5 and 23229 of, and to add Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 21215) to Chapter 1 of Division 11 of, and to repeal Section 21215.2 of, the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Pedicabs.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB530 Pan Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 530 Pan Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB530 Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-08 - Assembly - SB 530 Pan Senate Third Reading By MCCARTY (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Governmental Organization (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB530 Pan (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2949.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | June 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and G.O. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1022.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 826.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | April 28 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 28. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | April 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 5353 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5353.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5359 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5359.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5364 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5373.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5373.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 5384.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 21215 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 21215.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 23229 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 467.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |