CA SB519 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6024 of, and to add Sections 832.10 and 6034 to, the Penal Code, relating to corrections.
Title
Corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] | Asm. Akilah Weber [D] | Sen. Catherine Blakespear [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB519 Atkins et al. Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 519 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Atkins et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 519 Atkins Senate Third Reading By Weber (Y: 57 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB519 Atkins et al (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 306, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-04 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-20 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 2741.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 3262.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2023-07-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and L. GOV. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1289.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1174.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 938.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 901.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on PUB S. and GOV. & F. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26 in GOV. & F. pending receipt. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 6024 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 6034 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 832.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |