CA SB48 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22871.3, 22874.3, 22879, and 22958.1 of the Government Code, relating to state public employee benefits, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State public employee benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - Assembly - SB 48 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Committee On B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Budget and Fiscal Review ] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB48 Committee On B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Budget and Fiscal Review ] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 3, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-03-15 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 564.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 24. Noes 3.) (March 2). |
2017-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 219.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4. Page 172.) (February 9). |
2017-02-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 162.) (February 6). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Set for hearing February 9 in B. & F.R. pending receipt. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and B. & F.R. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Set for hearing February 6 in P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-12-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 22871.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22874.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22879 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 22958.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |