CA SB47 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 3 (commencing with Section 115810) of Chapter 4 of Part 10 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to environmental health.
Title
Environmental health: artificial turf.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-13 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-01-14 | Senate | January 13 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 2894.) |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 13. |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-01-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | April 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 349.) (March 18). |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-12-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 17. |
2014-12-17 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected January 12). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 115810 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 115812 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42872 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 42873 | Amended Code | Citation Text |