CA SB460 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53091 of the Government Code, to amend Section 25107 of, and to add Section 25502.1 to, the Public Resources Code, and to repeal Section 12808.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: transmission lines.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-06-30 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-06-29 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-05-28 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-08 | Set for hearing May 18. | |
2009-04-30 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-29 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 683.) | |
2009-04-22 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-04-17 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-04-16 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-04-14 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-03-12 | To Com. on RLS. | |
2009-02-27 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |