CA SB454 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 418, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 418, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 8.7 (commencing with Section 44268) to Part 5 of Division 26 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
Public resources: electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB454 Corbett Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 454 Corbett Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB454 Corbett (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Communications (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 454 Corbett Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL (Y: 51 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB454 Corbett (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Communications (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 418, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 2290.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3020.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1159.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1014.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 750.) (April 30). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 487.) (April 9). |
2013-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U., & C. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44268 | New Code | See Bill Text |