CA SB43 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 1367.005 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 10112.27 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: essential health benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB43 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 43 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 43 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB43 Hernandez (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 648, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2421.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2726.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-08-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 17) |
2015-07-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (July 14). |
2015-07-07 | Assembly | July 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1194.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 859.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-01-05 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2014-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.005 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10112.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |