CA SB419 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1214 and 2085.5 of the Penal Code, relating to restitution.
Title
Restitution: collection of fines, fees, and orders.
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Block [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB419 Block Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 419 Block Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 419 Block Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB419 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-28 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-27 - Assembly - SB 419 Block Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-19 - Assembly - SB 419 Block Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB419 Block (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 513, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-29 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5015.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4979.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6576.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6316.) Read third time and amended. (Page 6346.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6171.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6022.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-13 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1086.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2085.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 3454 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4019 | Amended Code | Citation Text |