CA SB400 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39719 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Global Warming Solutions Act of 2006:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB400 Lara (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Natural Resources (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB400 Lara (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | August 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2015-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and TRANS. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1249.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1153.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29 in E.Q. pending receipt. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 731.) (April 21). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21 pending receipt. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39719.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |