CA SB4 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on September 20 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 3213, 3215, 3236.5, and 3401 of, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 3150) to Chapter 1 of Division 3 of, the Public Resources Code, and to add Section 10783 to the Water Code, relating to oil and gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas: well stimulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-11 - SB4 Pavley Senate Third Reading By GRAY (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Unfinished Supp 1 SB4 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - SB4 Pavley Senate Third Reading Amend By GRAY Set #1 (Y: 53 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate 3rd Reading SB4 Pavley (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Environmental Quality (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-09-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 313, Statutes of 2013.
2013-09-20 Approved by the Governor.
2013-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2013-09-11SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 2373.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 3176.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2949.) Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2013-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (August 30).
2013-08-21AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 1).
2013-06-25AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-06-24AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-06-18AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Corrected June 19.)
2013-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2013-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1158.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-24SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1004.) (May 23).
2013-05-21SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-05-20SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2013-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 788.) (May 1).
2013-04-24SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-04-12SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2013-04-11SenateRe-referred to Com. on E.Q.
2013-04-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2013-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 9.
2013-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2013-01-10SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and PUB. S.
2012-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2012-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code3150New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code3213Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3215Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3236.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3401Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10783New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_4&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130311_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130424_amended_sen_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130424_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v95.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130618_amended_asm_v94.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130625_amended_asm_v93.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130311_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130424_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130507_amended_sen_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130524_amended_sen_v95.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130618_amended_asm_v94.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130625_amended_asm_v93.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130806_amended_asm_v92.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130819_amended_asm_v91.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130903_amended_asm_v90.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130906_amended_asm_v89.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130916_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_bill_20130920_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130409_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130501_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130520_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130529_0408PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130701_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130830_000003_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130906_1214PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130911_0743PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sb_4_vote_20130911_1131AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback