CA SB374 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Vetoed on October 11 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-02-27 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 30515 and 30900 of, and to add Section 30902 to, the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: assault weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-09-12 - Unfinished Business SB374 Steinberg Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-10 - SB 374 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 44 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Special Order SB374 Steinberg (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-27 Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
2013-10-11 In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
2013-10-11 Vetoed by the Governor.
2013-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2013-09-12SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 2432.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2013-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2013-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 31. Page 3146.) Ordered to the Senate.
2013-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Page 2946.) Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-03AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-08-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (August 30).
2013-08-21AssemblySet, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2013-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-08-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 1151.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-05-28SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m.
2013-05-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1012.) (May 23).
2013-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 23.
2013-05-06SenatePlaced on APPR. suspense file.
2013-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2013-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2013-02-28SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2013-02-20SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code27566New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code30515Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code30900Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code30902New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_374&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130220_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130220_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130528_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130805_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130906_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_bill_20130918_enrolled.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130416_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130506_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130523_000002_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130529_1145AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130813_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130830_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130910_0347PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0351-0400/sb_374_vote_20130912_1030PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback