CA SB37 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 391, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 391, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 10723 of the Water Code, and to create the Kings River East Groundwater Sustainability Agency, and prescribing its boundaries, organization, operation, management, financing, and other powers and duties, relating to water districts.
Title
Kings River East Groundwater Sustainability Agency Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Vidak [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Rudy Salas [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB37 Vidak Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 37 Vidak Senate Third Reading By MATHIS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB37 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-25 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 37 Vidak Senate Third Reading By MATHIS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Water, Parks and Wildlife (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Local Government (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB37 Nielsen Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-24 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-16 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 391, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5492.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 5437.) |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing August 25. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6089.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cooper. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and W., P., & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 16). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 631.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2014-12-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1. |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10723 | Amended Code | Citation Text |