CA SB363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 516, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 516, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5260, 9260, 23000, 25100, 25101.1, and 25302 of the Corporations Code, to amend Section 22050.5 of the Financial Code, and to amend Sections 16305.8 and 16522 of the Government Code, relating to financial transactions.
Title
Financial transactions: corporate entities, securities, loans, and deposits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-05 - Senate - Special Consent SB363 I., B. & F.I (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 363 I., B. & F.I. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB363 B. & F.I (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-31 - Assembly - SB 363 I., B. & F.I. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB363 B. & F.I (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 516, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2855.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | June 19 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | June 5 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 23000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25101.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 25302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 9260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22050.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16305.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |