CA SB359 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to vehicular air pollution, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Vehicles: retirement and replacement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB359 Corbett (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB359 Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Senate Third Reading By MULLIN (Y: 62 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-09-06 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Senate Third Reading By WIECKOWSKI Amend By WIECKOWSKI Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - SB 359 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB359 Corbett (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 415, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 2444.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 2454.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3315.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (September 12). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3335.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 10. Page 3337.) Ordered to the Senate. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3167.) Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 3167.) From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2013-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2961.) . Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 2962.) Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2796.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21). |
2013-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2013-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and H. & C.D. |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 943.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 788.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21092.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21159.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |