CA SB35 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 319.5, 8902, 8903, 18370, 18541, and 18568 of, and to add Sections 18372 and 18504 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-09 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB35 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 35 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 35 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman Amendment Set #1 (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB35 Umberg (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-08 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Assembly - SB 35 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 61 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-31 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - SB 35 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Berman Amendment Set #1 (Y: 59 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-08-19 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB35 Umberg (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Rules] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-17 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 2545.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-08 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2538.) |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Set for hearing September 8. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2418.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2021-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 13. Page 2691.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 31). |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 59. Noes 15. Page 2513.) |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19). |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2021-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 16). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on ELECTIONS and PUB. S. |
2021-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 2. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 3. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 498.) (March 15). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 15. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2020-12-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7. |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18370 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18372 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 18504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 18541 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 18568 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 319.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8902 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 8903 | Amended Code | Citation Text |