CA SB35 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 745, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 745, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 629.98 of the Penal Code, relating to wiretapping.
Title
Wiretapping: authorization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB35 Pavley Concurrence (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 35 Pavley Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB35 Pavley (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Education (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 35 Pavley Senate Third Reading By HOLDEN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB35 Pavley (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Education (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 745, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-02 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6408.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6283.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2644.) (January 23). |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2590.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 564.) (April 16). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 2. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and ED. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2012-12-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 4. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66090 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 629.98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |