CA SB302 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-30 - Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14501 of, to add Sections 38087, 38096, 38097, 38098, and 38104 to, and to repeal Sections 38092 and 38102 of, the Education Code, relating to school cafeterias.
Title
School cafeterias: cafeteria fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB302 Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - Senate - Special Consent #8 SB302 Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-30 | Assembly | Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2013-07-03 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1203.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23). |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 786.) (May 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 14501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 14502.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 35400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 38087 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 38092 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 38096 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 38097 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 38098 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 38102 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 38104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Education Code | 47605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |