CA SB27 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 9084 of the Elections Code, and to amend Sections 82015, 82048.7, 84105, and 88001 of, and to add Sections 84222 and 84223 to, the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB27 Correa Urgency Clause (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - SB 27 Correa Third Reading Urgency By GORDON (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB27 Correa Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB27 Correa Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - SB 27 Correa Third Reading Urgency By GORDON (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - SB 27 Correa Senate Third Reading Amend By GORDON Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB27 Correa (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - SB 27 Correa Third Reading Urgency By GORDON (Y: 58 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB27 Correa Reconsider (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB27 Correa Urgency Clause (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - Assembly - SB 27 Correa Third Reading Urgency By GORDON (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - Assembly - SB 27 Correa Senate Third Reading Amend By GORDON Set #1 (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB27 Correa (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 16, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-05-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 3414.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 12. Page 4764.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 4428.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, urgency clause adopted, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Urgency clause refused adoption. Senate refused to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 26. Noes 4. Page 2915.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Correa. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2915.) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 3871.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 23. Page 3622.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | From inactive file. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Atkins. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1114.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1005.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 749.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2012-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9084 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 81004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82015 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82048.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84222 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 84223 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 88001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |