CA SB255 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Disorderly conduct: invasion of privacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Cannella [R] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] |
Sen. Loni Hancock [D] | Sen. Steve Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-09-11 - Assembly - SB 255 Cannella Third Reading Urgency By QUIRK (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB255 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB255 Cannella Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Supp 1 SB255 Cannella Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB255 Cannella Urgency Clause (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 466, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3180.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-08-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-08-15 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1855.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1636.) (July 1). |
2013-06-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1251.) (June 4). |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing June 4. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 78581 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 653.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |