CA SB231 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-31 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 104 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to regulatory boards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulatory boards: healing arts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-31 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-02-17 Referred to Com. on RLS.
2011-02-10 From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2011-02-09 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code104Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback