CA SB212 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1004, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1004, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 42030) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Solid waste: pharmaceutical and sharps waste stewardship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Assembly - SB 212 Jackson Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 72 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB212 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB212 Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB212 Jackson et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB212 Jackson (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 1004, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6167.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 6198.) |
2018-08-31 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on EQ. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 6112.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 29). |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 16). |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 703.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 536.) (March 29). |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 117670.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42030 | New Code | See Bill Text |