CA SB206 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10072.6 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Electronic benefits transfer cards: prohibition of use for alcohol and tobacco purchases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Read first time. From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10072.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |