CA SB199 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 915, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 915, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 16250 and 16700 of the Penal Code, relating to BB devices.
Title
BB devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin de Leon [D] | Sen. Noreen Evans [D] | Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Asm. Wesley Chesbro [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Mariko Yamada [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB199 De Le (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 199 De Leon Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 43 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB199 De Le (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 199 De Leon Senate Third Reading By LEVINE (Y: 43 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB199 De Le (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 915, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2014-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4937.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 34. Page 6495.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6339.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 6). |
2014-08-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 2664.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2644.) (January 23). |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected April 1.) |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1230 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1230.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16250 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 16700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |